FL H1081 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional duties for Statewide Office for Suicide Prevention & Suicide Prevention Coordinating Counsel; revises composition of council; expands definition of "mental illness" to provide certain exclusions; revises entities that are exempt from certain licensing requirements; authorizes jails to share medical information pertaining to specified defendants to DCF; requires maintenance of psychotropic medications to specified defendants.
Title
Substance Abuse and Mental Health
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Cyndi Stevenson [R] | Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-31 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1554 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1554 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S7012 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 2019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 20195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 9085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |