FL H1083 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring verification that certain strategies have been utilized and certain outreach has been initiated before a principal or his or her designee contacts a law enforcement officer under specified circumstances; providing an exception, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Mental Health Procedures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#649 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10SenateReceived
2020-03-10SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2020-03-10SenateIn Messages
2020-03-10HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-10HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-09HouseTemporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (316531)
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-26HouseFavorable by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-02-12HouseNow in Education Committee
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-05HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-05HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee; Education Committee
2020-02-05HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
2020-02-04HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-04HouseCS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HousePCS on Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Education Committee
2020-01-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1062 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
H407 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
S1426 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S7040 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7065
H945 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-107

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback