FL H1087 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DOR to accept voluntary contributions from participating businesses; authorizes participating business to solicit contributions from customers; directs DOR to deposit contributions into Public Education Capital Outlay & Debt Service Trust Fund; authorizes DOR to adopt emergency rules.
Title
Voluntary Contributions to Public School Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to Finance and Tax Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-24 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1250 (Same As) 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1087 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1087/BillText/Filed/PDF |