FL H1087 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that consumer representative appointed by Governor to corporation's board of governors is not prohibited from practicing in certain professions; authorizes use of certain policyholder information by private insurers in analyzing risks; prohibits use of information to directly solicit policyholders; requires policyholder, after date certain, to receive certain information related to demonstrations of interest by insurers; allows policyholder to elect to limit frequency of solicitations for take-out offers; provides circumstances under which policyholder whose policy was taken out to be considered renewal policyholder.
Title
Operations of the Citizens Property Insurance Corporation
Sponsors
House Regulatory Affairs Committee | House Insurance and Banking Subcommittee | Rep. Michael Bileca [R] | Sen. Frank Artiles [R] |
Rep. Jose Diaz [R] | Rep. Dwight Dudley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#163 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#163 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Veto Message received (2015 Special Session A) |
2015-06-02 | Vetoed by Governor | |
2015-05-18 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2015-04-28 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2015-04-28 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1006 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-04-21 | Senate | In Messages |
2015-04-16 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (198103) |
2015-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/15/15 |
2015-04-07 | House | CS/CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2015-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-04-01 | House | CS/CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 04/01/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-27 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee read 1st time |
2015-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2015-03-25 | House | CS by Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-23 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, 03/25/15, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2015-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1006 (Similar To) 2015-04-27 - Laid on Table
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 3517 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |