FL H1087 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Chapter No. 2020-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-28 - Chapter No. 2020-6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises duties of DCF in relation to domestic violence program; removes duties & functions of Florida Coalition Against Domestic Violence with respect to domestic violence; revises requirements of domestic violence centers; removes coalition from capital improvement grant program process.
Title
Domestic Violence Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#467 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#467 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Chapter No. 2020-6 | |
2020-02-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-02-27 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-02-26 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Received |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1482 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-20 | House | Immediately certified |
2020-02-20 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (680903) |
2020-02-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20 |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/06/20, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-28 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 01/30/20, 11:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | CS referred to Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 9:30 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1482 (Same As) 2020-02-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1087
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0072 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 8296 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 902 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 9035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 905 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 9055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
753 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 1701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |