FL H1093 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides reduced criminal penalties for distribution or possession of certain amounts of cannabis concentrate or THC in cannabis products or edibles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1312 (Same As) 2019-04-03 - Withdrawn from further consideration

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback