FL H1099 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises & provides exemptions from public records requirements for certain information contained in motorist records held by DHSMV, crash reports, certain crash report data elements within computerized database, uniform traffic citations that reveal personal information, & certain traffic citation data elements within computerized database; provides retroactive applicability; prohibits certain persons or entities from disclosing confidential information; provides exceptions; requires sworn statements or memoranda of understanding; provides construction; provides penalties; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.
Title
Public Records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 0712 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 066 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1099 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1099/BillText/Filed/PDF |