FL H1105 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain training for judges; authorizes & provides requirements for early childhood court programs; authorizes DCF to file petitions; requires court to consider specified factors when determining change of legal custody or placement; revises & provides requirements for case plans; provides requirements for court jurisdiction, information disclosure, & caregiver recommendations; provides timeframes for certain studies & licensing; provides requirements & processes for adoption of certain children; provides responsibilities for foster parents, birth or legal parents, DCF, & community-based care lead agency; requires employees of residential group homes to meet specified requirements; authorizes community-based care lead agency to provide more than 35 percent of all child welfare services under certain conditions.
Title
Child Welfare
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Josie Tomkow [R] | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] |
Rep. Rick Roth [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#621 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#621 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-138 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1324 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (957847) |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 26 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/05/20, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2020-01-27 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-24 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-24 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 9:30 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-06 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H43 (Similar To) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-40
S122 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H449 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S236 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S122 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 43
S1324 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1105
S1548 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H449 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S236 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 385 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 01304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0138 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 522 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 6225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 1451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 988 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 093 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |