FL H1115 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes certain individuals to prescribe & dispense limited supply of medicinal drugs to any patient of hospital emergency department or patient discharged from hospital under certain circumstances; authorizes community pharmacy to use automated pharmacy system under certain circumstances; requires Board of Pharmacy to adopt rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dispensing Medicinal Drugs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#369 (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#219 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in returning Messages
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-05-03SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-03HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 109 NAYS 0
2019-05-03HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (203208) 1245
2019-05-03HouseAmendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (489627)
2019-05-01HouseIn returning messages
2019-05-01SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-01SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30SenateAmendment(s) adopted (203208)
2019-04-30SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-30SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1124
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-30SenateWithdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateReceived
2019-04-25SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2019-04-25SenateIn Messages
2019-04-25HouseCS passed; YEAS 110 NAYS 0
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-18HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-11HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-11HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-09HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseCS referred to Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-28HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-27HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2019-03-27HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-26HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-03-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1124 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table
H687 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1170 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
465019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650235Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/BillText/c2/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/287915/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/799184/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/613886/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/203208/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/489627/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Amendment/480872/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Vote/HouseVote_h01115c2219.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Vote/SenateVote_h01115c2018.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1115/Vote/HouseVote_h01115c2369.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback