FL H1121 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DEP to submit report to Legislature; abrogates scheduled repeal of provisions governing DEP, DOS, FWCC, & DACS support organizations; repeals Florida Intergovernmental Relations Foundation & directs EOG & foundation to satisfy liabilities & transfer funds; authorizes court to order persons convicted of certain violations to pay additional assessment; authorizes specified citizen support organization to pay certain rewards.
Title
Support Organizations
Sponsors
House State Affairs Committee | House Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | Rep. Thad Altman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#356 (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#239 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#239 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Chapter No. 2019-93 | |
2019-06-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-02 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (139286) |
2019-05-01 | House | In returning messages |
2019-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 676 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (139286) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 7074 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-18 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-11 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-10 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/10/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-28 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-13 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7022 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7024 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S7062 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7024 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93), SB 2502 (Ch. 2019-116)
S7062 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
257 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
259 | 10521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
267 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 772 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 809 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 223 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
379 | 2231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
413 | 615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 691 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
570 | 83 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |