FL H1129 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires certain membership organizations that provide child care to be licensed as child care facilities; revises training requirements for child care personnel; exempts certain organizations from child care facility licensing standards; establishes licensure fee for certain after-school programs; provides appropriation.
Title
Licensure of Child Care Programs
Sponsors
House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. Robert Cortes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 6 |
2018-02-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-02-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-31 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-30 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 6 |
2018-01-26 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 01/30/18, 8:30 am, 12 HOB |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1520 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 82 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
402 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |