FL H1143 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides requirements relating to human tissue donation; provides penalties; implements Interstate Medical Licensure Compact; provides for interstate medical licensure process & requirements for multistate practice; revises provisions relating to licensure & regulation of clinical social workers, marriage & family therapists, & mental health counselors; revises provisions relating to interns in mental health profession; revises provisions relating to massage therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#630 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseAmendment(s) adopted (153923)
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2020-03-02HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-28HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 03/02/20, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-11HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-11HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-07HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall
2020-02-06HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-02-05HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-02-05HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-03HouseCS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2020-01-30HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H707 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H713 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-133
S230 (Similar To) 2020-03-13 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 713
S782 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S926 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1124 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1183 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1742 passed
H1269 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
S1684 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1742 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-78
H389 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-7
H427 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H647 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1319 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
H1341 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S390 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S626 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S772 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4564504Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583129Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459074Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4651893Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
466036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
477013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4770265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800465Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480047Amended CodeSee Bill Text
480052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910149Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5140115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55377Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276619Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76828Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/BillText/e1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/736867/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/969779/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/473851/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/758787/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/313567/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Amendment/279341/PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1143/Vote/HouseVote_h01143e1630.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback