FL H1147 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires certain licensed facilities, providers, & health care practitioners to furnish & provide access to records & reports within specified timeframes after receiving request for such records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Access to Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#498 (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Rules
2020-03-03SenateIn Messages
2020-02-26HousePassed; YEAS 106 NAYS 8
2020-02-26HouseRead 3rd time
2020-02-26HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 3
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Sumner Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 1
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-07HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1882 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback