FL H1157 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts physicians & osteopathic physicians who provide certain number of hours of pro bono services from continuing education requirements; revises eligibility criteria for restricted license; establishes registration program for volunteer retired physicians & osteopathic physicians; authorizes Board of Medicine & Board of Osteopathic Medicine to deny, revoke, or impose restrictions or conditions on registration for certain violations; revises licensure criteria applicable to Canadian applicants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Health Care Practitioner Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied on Calendar
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-16HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-04-16HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-04-09HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-04-09HouseFavorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2019-04-05HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/09/19, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2019-03-19HouseNow in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseFavorable by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2019-03-15HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1498 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45900751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45900752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback