FL H1163 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1344, CS/SB 82 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1344, CS/SB 82 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires facilities that have been granted certificate-of-need exemption to demonstrate & maintain compliance with specified criteria; provides exemption from certificate-of-need requirement for certain intermediate care facilities; limits number of certain exemptions granted by AHCA; provides for termination of certain exemptions after specified period; requires AHCA to monitor progress of exemption holders; provides for future legislative review & repeal.
Title
Intermediate Care Facilities
Sponsors
House Health and Human Services Committee | House Health Market Reform Subcommittee | Sen. Colleen Burton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 1344, CS/SB 82 passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | CS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-27 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-26 | House | CS/CS by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-07 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1344 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-60
S82 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-71
S82 (Similar To) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-71
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 962 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 036 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |