FL H1171 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides parental rights relating to a minor child's education, upbringing, & health care; provides school district, health care practitioner, hospital requirements & specified penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parental Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Judiciary Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-18HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2019-04-17HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee read 1st time
2019-04-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-04-16HouseCS/CS by Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 12 NAYS 4
2019-04-12HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall
2019-03-25HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseCS by Education Committee read 1st time
2019-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-03-21HouseCS by Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-03-19HouseOn Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 03/21/19, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseReferred to Education Committee; Health and Human Services Committee; Judiciary Committee
2019-02-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1726 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101401Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101404Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101406Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408813Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback