FL H1173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides exemption from public records requirements for nonjudicial record of arrest of minor who has successfully completed diversion program; provides for retroactive application; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemption; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Nonjudicial Arrest Record of a Minor

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseLaid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
2020-02-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-12HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-10HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-21HouseNow in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
2020-01-21HouseFavorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-16HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/21/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2020-01-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H615 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 1292 passed
S1292 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
S700 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430582Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback