FL H1179 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain entities from making certain determinations or engaging in certain actions related to organ transplants solely on basis of individual's disability; provides exceptions; provides cause of action for injunctive & other relief; prohibits certain insurers, nonprofit health care service plans, & HMOs that provide coverage for organ transplants from denying coverage solely on basis of individual's disability.
Title
Nondiscrimination in Organ Transplants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#8 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#501 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#501 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Chapter No. 2020-139 | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 665 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1556 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations |
2020-03-03 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-02-26 | House | CS passed; YEAS 111 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-02 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-02 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-02 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1556 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1179
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 64197 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 65736 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |