FL H1187 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Deleting a requirement that yacht and ship brokers maintain a separate license for each branch office and related fees; repealing provisions relating to the duties of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; deleting the authority of the department to reprimand, censure, or impose probation on certain business organizations; requiring injuries to racing greyhounds to be reported within a certain timeframe on a form adopted by the Division of Pari-mutuel Wagering of the department, etc.
Title
Department of Business and Professional Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#771 (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2016-03-07 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-07 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 106 NAYS 2 |
2016-03-07 | House | Amendment temporarily postponed (877471) |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-04 | House | Amendment temporarily postponed (154547) |
2016-03-04 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (673727, 860767) |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/16 |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-01 | House | CS by Regulatory Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2016-03-01 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-25 | House | CS by- Regulatory Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Regulatory Affairs Committee, 02/25/16, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-16 | House | Now in Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-02-16 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/16/16, 9:30 am, Morris Hall |
2016-02-02 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Favorable by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 7 NAYS 5 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 10:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1050 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
H0535 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
S0704 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129), CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
S0768 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
H1199 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H7109 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S0412 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7072 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
H0535 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Chapter No. 2016-129, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
S0704 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129), CS/CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2016-83)
S0768 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2016-129)
H1199 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
H7109 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died on Calendar
S0412 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Regulated Industries
S7072 (Similar To) 2016-03-11 - Died in Appropriations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
326 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
447 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 404 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 407 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 408 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 409 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 410 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 411 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 412 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 415 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 451 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 452 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 453 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4536 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 454 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4561 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 45615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 4565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 457 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
469 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
474 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 019 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 0265 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
477 | 029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 219 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 229 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 311 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
481 | 329 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
489 | 518 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
492 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
550 | 2416 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |