FL H1201 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from altering trademark of manufacturer, rectifier, bottler, or brand owner on products shipped into this state.
Title
Licensure as American Source of Supply
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | House | Died in Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Business and Professional Regulation Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced |
2014-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1552 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Regulated Industries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
561 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
562 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1201 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1201/BillText/Filed/PDF |