FL H1203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to apprenticeship & preapprenticeship programs, statewide articulation agreement, FEFP, CAPE Industry Certification Funding List; requires Articulation Coordinating Committee to approve mathematics pathways by a specified date; requires Commissioner of Education to submit to certain entities report with recommendations relating to implementation of Pathways in Technology Early College High School program; provides requirements for such program & report.
Title
Pathways to Career Opportunities
Sponsors
House Education Committee | House Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee | Rep. Amber Mariano [R] | Rep. Jennifer Webb [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 29 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 01/29/20, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-23 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-22 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-22 | House | CS by Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-17 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 9:30 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S866 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S1568 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1568 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7067 (Similar To) 2020-06-26 - Chapter No. 2020-95
H7103 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1007 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 80 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
445 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
446 | 092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |