FL H1209 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-156
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes goals for DCF relating to caregivers; provides responsibilities of department; provides for dispute resolution.
Title
Caregivers for Children in Out-of-Home Care
Sponsors
House Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee | Rep. James Buchanan [R] | Rep. Kimberly Daniels [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Fetterhoff [R] |
Rep. Spencer Roach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#173 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#173 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chapter No. 2019-156 | |
2019-06-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2019-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1432 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-09 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/09/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-25 | House | CS by Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed -HJ |
Same As/Similar To
S1432 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2019-156)