FL H1213 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-88
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Commissioner of Education's African American History Task Force to determine ways in which the 1920 Ocoee Election Day Riots will be included in required instruction on African-American history; directing the Secretary of State to take certain action regarding the inclusion of the history of the 1920 Ocoee Election Day Riots in museum exhibits; directing the Secretary of Environmental Protection to assess naming opportunities for state parks, or a portion of a facility therein, in recognizing victims of the 1920 Ocoee Election Day Riots; encouraging district school boards to assess naming opportunities for naming school facilities in recognition of victims of the 1920 Ocoee Election Day Riots; including certain instruction related to anti-Semitism in the required instruction relating to the Holocaust; designating a certain week as "Holocaust Education Week", etc.
Title
Educational Instruction of Historical Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#748 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#592 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#592 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-88 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (484636) |
2020-03-11 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 682 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (484636) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1628 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (573623) |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (292289) 868 |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-17 | House | CS/CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-12 | House | CS/CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Reed Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-30 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1628 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1213
H1245 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1262 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
H1245 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S1262 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages