FL H1217 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes hospitals, emergency medical services stations, & fire stations to use newborn safety devices to accept surrendered newborn infants under certain circumstances; requires such entities to visually check & test device within specified timeframes; adds locations under which prohibition on initiation of criminal investigations based solely on surrendering of newborn infant applies.
Title
Surrendered Newborn Infants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#548 (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#516 (Y: 42 N: 68 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#516 (Y: 42 N: 68 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 2 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) failed (325181) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-04 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Favorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 8:00 am, Mashburn Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S864 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 0423 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |