FL H1221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2019-54)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2019-54)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises boating safety identification requirements for certain persons; authorizes FWCC to appoint certain agents to administer boating safety education courses & temporary certification examinations, issue boating safety identification cards & temporary certificates in digital, electronic, or paper formats, & charge & collect specified fees; authorizes FWCC to issue boating safety identification cards & temporary certificates in digital, electronic, or paper formats; directs FWCC to conduct study relating to certain vessels & submit report to Governor & Legislature; authorizes certain counties to create no-discharge zones; provides requirements for discharge outside of such zones & provides penalty for violations; prohibits residing or dwelling on certain derelict vessels until certain conditions are met.
Title
Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/SB 1666 (Ch. 2019-54) |
2019-04-30 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2019-04-29 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-26 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (453447) |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-26 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 8:30 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-21 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1666 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Chapter No. 2019-54
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
327 | 395 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 4109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
327 | 73 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
328 | 72 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |