FL H1223 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislature to fund FEFP at level that ensures instructional personnel & educational support employees earn living wage; provides minimum base salaries for or specified percentage increases to base salaries of instructional personnel for certain years; provides specified percentage increases to base salaries of educational support employees for certain years.
Title
Instructional Personnel and Educational Support Employee Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee; Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S106 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1854 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1400 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1854 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1223 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1223/BillText/Filed/PDF |