FL H1225 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires child's parent or guardian to be responsible for restitution for damage or loss caused by child's offense; authorizes court to establish payment plan; revises provisions concerning when child's parent or guardian may be absolved of liability for restitution in certain circumstances; provides DCF, foster parents, & specified facilities & agencies are not considered parents or guardians for purposes of restitution.
Title
Restitution for Juvenile Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-20 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-18 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 11 NAYS 4 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-03 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | CS referred to Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-01-31 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-31 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1880 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
985 | 437 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 513 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |