FL H1227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates independent commission on legislative apportionment & congressional redistricting; provides for purpose, duties, membership, & funding of commission; requires commission to conduct public hearings; subjects commission to government-in-the-sunshine & financial disclosure requirements; prohibits persons not serving on or employed by commission from influencing or attempting to influence commission members & employees other than through specified manner; provides criminal penalties.
Title
Legislative Apportionment and Congressional Redistricting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1640 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1227 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1227/BillText/Filed/PDF |