FL H1235 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes requirement that certain children present certification of adolescent well-care examination each school year; requires district school boards & private school governing authorities to develop & enforce policy for such requirement; requires DOE, in consultation with DOH, to develop certification of adolescent well-care examination form.
Title
Well-Care Examinations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Education Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S208 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1235 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1235/BillText/Filed/PDF |