FL H1239 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires PSC, in consultation with other agencies, to recommend to Governor and Legislature a plan for development of electric vehicle charging station infrastructure along State Highway System; provides goals & objectives of plan; requires PSC to file status report with Governor & Legislature by specified date.
Title
Electric Vehicle Charging Station Infrastructure
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Diamond [D] | Rep. Dan Daley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Energy and Utilities Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Energy and Utilities Subcommittee; Government Operations and Technology Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7018 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
H943 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S452 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
H943 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
S452 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
H7099 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7018 passed
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1239 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1239/BillText/Filed/PDF |