FL H1259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-89
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the involuntary placement of pregnant prisoners in restrictive housing; providing exceptions; requiring corrections officials to write a specified report if circumstances necessitate placing a pregnant prisoner in restrictive housing; providing requirements for the treatment of pregnant prisoners placed in restrictive housing; requiring pregnant prisoners to be placed in a designated medical housing unit or admitted to the infirmary under certain circumstances; expanding enforcement provisions to provide for grievances for violations relating to restrictive housing of pregnant prisoners, etc.
Title
Incarcerated Pregnant Women
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#31 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#770 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#651 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#770 (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#651 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Chapter No. 2020-89 | |
2020-06-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-14 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) (436717) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | In returning messages |
2020-03-13 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 112 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-13 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment(s) as amended (252236) 1254 |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment(s) to Senate amendment(s) adopted (436717) 1254 |
2020-03-12 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-12 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) reconsidered, adopted as amended (252236) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (916456) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 852 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations |
2020-03-10 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-10 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (215111) |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-26 | House | Favorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/26/20, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-13 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-11 | House | CS/CS by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 2:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S852 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1259
S854 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice
S854 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice