FL H1263 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits certain actions to influence firesafety inspector into violating certain provisions; prohibits firesafety inspector from knowingly & willfully accepting attempt to influence firesafety inspector into violating certain provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firesafety Inspectors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; Commerce Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1594 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
S1404 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1077 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
633217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback