FL H1279 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exemption from public records requirements for information contained in database of payment instrument transactions within OFR into which payment instrument transaction information submitted by money services business licensees is maintained; provides for specified access to such information; authorizes OFR to enter into information-sharing agreements & provide access to information contained in database to certain governmental agencies; requires any department or agency that receives confidential information to maintain confidentiality; provides penalty for willful disclosure of confidential information; provides for future review & repeal of exemption.
Title
Pub. Rec./Money Services Businesses Database of Payment Instrument Transactions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1277 (Ch. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Insurance and Banking Subcommittee; Government Operations Subcommittee; Economic Affairs Committee -HJ 214 | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced -HJ 127 | |
2012-01-05 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1279 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1279/BillText/Filed/PDF |