FL H1279 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines terms "gender identity" & "sexual orientation"; revises functions of Florida Commission on Human Relations; revises provisions regarding remedies for unlawful discrimination to include discrimination based on sexual orientation & gender identity in area of employment; adds sexual orientation & gender identity as impermissible grounds for discrimination with respect to specified unlawful employment practices; provides exception to specified provisions for constitutionally protected free exercise of religion.
Title
Prohibited Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Civil Justice Subcommittee; Business and Professions Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S438 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H485 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S430 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H485 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
S430 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
760 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
760 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1279 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1279/BillText/Filed/PDF |