FL H1279 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires AHCA to publish annual report on certain health care services by specified date; revises definition of term "shoppable health care service"; revises duties of certain health insurers & HMOs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied on Calendar
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-18HouseFavorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-14HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall
2020-02-05HouseNow in Health and Human Services Committee
2020-02-05HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 25 NAYS 0
2020-02-03HouseOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/05/20, 10:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-28HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2020-01-28HouseFavorable by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2020-01-24HouseOn Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1836 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
S1726 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131076Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback