FL H1281 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1508 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1508 passed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits person from knowingly selling, exchanging, or transferring police vehicle without removing any police markings from vehicle & confirming that police markings have been removed.
Title
Police Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1508 passed |
2020-01-30 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | CS referred to State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-01-28 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 01/28/20, 12:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Criminal Justice Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1508 (Same As) 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-62