FL H1289 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits health care practitioner from performing pelvic examination on patient without first obtaining written consent of patient or patient's legal representative; provides exceptions.
Title
Informed Consent for Pelvic Examinations
Sponsors
House Health Quality Subcommittee | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] | Sen. Tracie Davis [D] | Rep. Anna Eskamani [D] |
Rep. David Silvers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/26/20 |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-10 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/12/20, 10:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | CS referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-03 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/03/20, 3:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |