FL H1291 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides procedure & conditions for parent of student who is qualified patient to request assistance with the administration of medical marijuana during school day; requires school principal who receives request authorizing administration of marijuana to student to notify county health department; requires county health department that has received such notification to notify DOH; provides procedures & authorization for county-designated caregivers to administer marijuana during school day; provides immunity from liability for county-designated caregiver under certain circumstances; requires designated area on school grounds for administering marijuana; provides funding from Grants & Donations Trust Fund.
Title
Medical Use of Marijuana in Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Drake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Health Quality Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Education Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2018-01-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S986 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1006 | 062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 986 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 9867 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1291 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1291/BillText/Filed/PDF |