FL H1293 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1306; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) -HJ 01174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1306; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) -HJ 01174
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises terminology relating to food stamp program & WAGES Program to conform to current federal law.
Title
Public Assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Marti Coley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/SB 1306; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209) -HJ 01174 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading -HJ 00902 | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable by- Health & Family Services Policy Council; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 -HJ 00610; Placed on Calendar -HJ 00610 | |
2010-04-02 | On Council agenda-- Health & Family Services Policy Council, 04/06/10, 9:00 am, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-17 | Now in Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00312 | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -HJ 00312 | |
2010-03-12 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations (CGHC), 03/16/10, 3:30 pm, Webster Hall | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable by Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); YEAS 11 NAYS 0 -HJ 00235; Now in Health Care Appropriations (CGHC) -HJ 00235 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Services Policy (HFPC), 03/09/10, 10:00 am, 306-H | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to Health Care Services Policy (HFPC); Health Care Appropriations (CGHC); Health & Family Services Policy Council -HJ 00205 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced -HJ 00117 | |
2010-02-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1306 (Similar To) 2010-06-07 - Chapter No. 2010-209
S1690 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209)
S1690 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Commerce, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 1306 (Ch. 2010-209)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0097 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 2523 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0163 | 456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0220 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0288 | 9618 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0341 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0379 | 353 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0402 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 2554 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 2576 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 903 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0409 | 942 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0411 | 0101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 0252 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 095 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0414 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0420 | 624 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0430 | 2053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0445 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0718 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0817 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0943 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |