FL H1293 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-03 - Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact legislation to allow states to enforce existing sales & use tax laws, treat similar sales transactions equally, without regard to manner in which sale was transacted, give states right to collect, or decide not to collect, taxes already owed under state law, & authorize states that have complied with Streamlined Sales & Use Tax Agreement to require out-of-state sellers to collect each state's sales & use tax.
Title
Streamlined Sales and Use Tax Agreement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Died in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Finance and Tax Subcommittee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0505 (Similar To) 2013-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1293 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2013/1293/BillText/Filed/PDF |