FL H1293 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Directs DOH to expand statewide screening of newborns to include screening for adrenoleukodystrophy within specified period after adrenoleukodystrophy is adopted for inclusion on federal recommended uniform screening panel.
Title
Newborn Adrenoleukodystrophy Screening
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-05 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee read 1st time |
2016-02-05 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-02 | House | CS by Health Quality Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Quality Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, 306 HOB |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Health Quality Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1640 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Health Policy