FL H1295 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Finance and Tax
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides criteria to be used in determining value of tax exemptions for charitable use of certain hospitals; provides application requirements for tax exemptions on certain properties.
Title
Property Tax Exemptions Used by Hospitals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#176 (Y: 71 N: 40 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Finance and Tax |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2019-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 71 NAYS 40 |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 |
2019-04-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/03/19, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-03-27 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee read 1st time |
2019-03-26 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-25 | House | CS/CS by Ways and Means Committee; YEAS 10 NAYS 4 |
2019-03-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Ways and Means Committee, 03/25/19, 12:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-20 | House | Now in Ways and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-19 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-19 | House | CS by Health Market Reform Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 1 |
2019-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Market Reform Subcommittee, 03/19/19, 3:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7123 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-42