FL H1295 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from public meeting requirements specified portions of meetings of Prescription Drug Affordability Commission; exempts from public records requirements specified records, transcripts, & information; requires commission to establish certain parameters; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statements of public necessity.
Title
Pub. Meetings and Rec./Prescription Drug Affordability Commission Trade Secrets
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Market Reform Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1293 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1295 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1295/BillText/Filed/PDF |