FL H1297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revises requirements related to drug testing, notices to employees & job applicants being drug tested, specimen collection & preservation, documentation, employers who have received drug testing results, & drug test confirmation & standards.
Title
Drug-free Workplaces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in Commerce Committee |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-12 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Appropriations Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 5 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee, 02/11/20, 4:00 pm, Webster Hall |
2020-02-05 | House | CS by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Now in Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 5 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 12 HOB |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Commerce Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1186 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 0455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
440 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |