FL H1301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires women inmates in state & county correctional systems who have newborn children be allowed visitation & physical touch privileges with their newborn children; prohibits such inmates from being relocated during term of their imprisonment; requires such inmates be allowed to be involved in determining care of their newborn children; requires sheriffs & chief correctional officers to adopt model standards relating to such inmates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Incarcerated Women with Newborn Children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-03HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1326 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1015 (Similar To) 2019-02-22 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
H49 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-65

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
951175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
95123Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback