FL H1305 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Chapter No. 2016-235
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes public school & private school, respectively, to enter into certain arrangements with wholesale distributors or manufacturers for epinephrine auto-injectors.
Title
Emergency Allergy Treatment in Schools
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#15 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#565 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#565 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | Chapter No. 2016-235 | |
2016-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-30 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1196 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Received |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2016-02-23 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-02-18 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/17/16 |
2016-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-10 | House | CS by Education Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-09 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-09 | House | CS by- Education Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-05 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Committee, 02/09/16, 12:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2016-02-03 | House | Now in Education Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Favorable by Education Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Education Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/02/16, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2016-01-26 | House | Now in Education Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-26 | House | Favorable by K-12 Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-22 | House | On Committee agenda-- K-12 Subcommittee, 01/26/16, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1196 (Similar To) 2016-03-08 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1305 (Ch. 2016-235)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 88 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |