FL H1317 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires DOH to adopt statewide fee schedules for services, supplies, & care provided in hospitals & ambulatory surgical centers; provides requirements for diagnostic testing & treatment plans; provides requirements for specified licensed medical professionals for diagnostic testing & treatment plans; provides additional grounds for disciplinary actions in health professions & occupations; revises medical benefits requirements under PIP coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Services and Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Health and Human Services Committee
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-12HousePCS on Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 04/16/19, 2:00 pm, Morris Hall -- Temporarily postponed
2019-03-08HouseReferred to Health and Human Services Committee; Commerce Committee; Appropriations Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1790 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3950176Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback