FL H1323 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DCF to contract for evaluation of effectiveness of certain programs; creates interagency working group for specified purposes; provides requirements for such working group & specified evaluations.
Title
Economic Self-sufficiency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#538 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (226673) |
2020-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20 |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-14 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/18/20, 3:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-02-11 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-07 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/11/20, 1:30 pm, Reed Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-04 | House | CS by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-31 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2020-01-17 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Appropriations Committee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1624 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1002 | 87 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |