FL H1327 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions relating to Florida Election Campaign Financing Act; deletes provisions governing public funding of campaigns for candidates for statewide office who agree to certain expenditure limits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign Finance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#531 (Y: 106 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-05SenateReceived
2020-03-05SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules
2020-03-04SenateIn Messages
2020-03-04HousePassed; YEAS 106 NAYS 10
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-02-27HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/20
2020-02-20HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-20HouseFavorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-18HouseOn Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall
2020-02-13HouseNow in State Affairs Committee
2020-02-13HouseFavorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-11HouseOn Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/13/20, 10:00 am, Sumner Hall
2020-02-04HouseNow in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee
2020-02-04HouseFavorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-01-31HouseOn Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 02/04/20, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall
2020-01-17HouseReferred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2020-01-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1325 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
S1108 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1110 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10622Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10630Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10631Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10632Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10633Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10634Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10635Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
106355Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10636Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32872Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback