FL H1333 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-24 - Chapter No. 2016-104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises sexual predator & offender criteria; revises reporting & registration requirements; revises elements of offense of loitering or prowling by certain offenders in close proximity to children; revises provisions relating for venue for proceedings for seeking removal of requirement to register as sexual predator or offender; requires that removal of registration requirement not conflict with federal law requirement; revises requirements concerning information to be released by DOC & DJJ regarding sexual offenders being released.
Title
Sexual Offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#713 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#713 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Chapter No. 2016-104 | |
2016-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-04 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2016-03-04 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1662 |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Received |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2016-03-04 | Senate | In Messages |
2016-03-04 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2016-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (973547) |
2016-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/16 |
2016-02-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-26 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2016-02-26 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2016-02-25 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-23 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/25/16, 1:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-02-09 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/08/16, 3:00 pm, Reed Hall |
2016-01-25 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | Favorable by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-21 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/25/16, 4:00 pm, Sumner Hall |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | House | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1662 (Same As) 2016-03-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1333 (Ch. 2016-104)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
397 | 4872 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
435 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0862 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
794 | 056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
856 | 022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 04354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
944 | 608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
947 | 1405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
948 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 481 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 4815 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |